+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 13, 2022 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0816
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Governor Approved
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022
- Second Reading
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022
- Arrive in Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-000-001
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 016-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.3f -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.53 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 130/4003 - from Ch. 73, par. 1504-3
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2022: HB5585 - Third Reading
March 23, 2022: HB5585 - Insurance
March 3, 2022: HB5585
February 15, 2022: HB5585 - Insurance
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor