+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 16, 2008 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
On July 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2008
On July 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-001-000
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading July 10, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Added as Co-Sponsor - Watson
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John J. Millner
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne and Watson
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-005-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff; -Dillard
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate International Trade & Commerce Committee; 007-001-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
July 10, 2008: HB5585 - Third Reading - Thursday, July 10, 2008
April 1, 2008: HB5585 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor