+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor