+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 310 ILCS 10/8.10a new -
- 310 ILCS 10/8.23 -
- 310 ILCS 10/17 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 17
- 310 ILCS 10/25 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 25
- 310 ILCS 10/25.01 new -
- 310 ILCS 10/25.02 new -
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor