+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0873
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 4, 2016
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 003
Provides that the Director of Juvenile Justice, or his or her designee, shall be a member of the Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Task Force.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the language of the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 1 with the following changes. Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Appoints various members to the Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Task Force, including the Executive Director of the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority, 2 academics or researchers who have studied issues related to adult sex offending, a representative of a legal organization that works with adult sex offenders who focus on the collateral consequences of conviction and registration, 2 treatment providers who specialize in adult treatment, a treatment provider who specializes in working with victims of sex offenses, 2 representatives from community-based organizations that work with adults convicted of sex offenses on re-entry, a statewide organization that represents or coordinates services for victims of sex offenses, a representative of a statewide organization that represents or is comprised of individuals convicted as adults of a sex offense who are currently on a registry, a public defender, and an appellate defender. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority may consult, contract, work in junction with, and obtain any information from any individual, agency, association, or research institution deemed appropriate by the Authority. Provides the Task Force provision is repealed on January 1, 2019.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts language of the introduced bill with the following changes. Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act (rather than the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois). Provides that the Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Task Force shall be an independent Task Force under the Illinois Criminal Information Authority (rather than the Department of State Police) for administrative purposes. Provides that the Executive Director of the Authority (rather the Director of State Police) shall appoint various members to the Task Force.