+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 3710/0.01 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 212.90
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor