+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor