+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- New Act
- 430 ILCS 65/3.4 new
- 430 ILCS 65/4 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-4
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-3
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3.5
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor