+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Remains in Labor Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor Committee; 001-003-000; Lost
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor Committee
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 820 ILCS 305/6 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.6
- 820 ILCS 310/1 - from Ch. 48, par. 172.36
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor