+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 020-000-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/15-301 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 15-301
+ − Vote
April 4, 2016: HB5531 - Transportation, Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor