+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 13, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0814
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2022
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Eliminates the legislative members of the Commission. Replaces these members with: (1) one member from an organization that facilitates visitation between incarcerated parents and children; (2) one member who is a researcher or member of an academic profession and has studied issues related to the impact of incarceration on youth; (3) one member who represents an organization with expertise in gender-responsive practices and assessing the impact of incarceration on women; and (4) one male who has previously been incarcerated and has been directly impacted by policies relating to children of incarcerated parents. Makes grammatical corrections.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 725 ILCS 5/Art. Art. 106G heading new
- 725 ILCS 5/106G-5 new
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2022: HB5525 - Third Reading
March 23, 2022: HB5525 - State Government
March 3, 2022: HB5525 - Third Reading
March 3, 2022: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
February 17, 2022: HB5525 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor