+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 225 ILCS 60/20 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-20
- 225 ILCS 65/55-35 -
- 225 ILCS 65/60-40 -
- 225 ILCS 65/65-60 - was 225 ILCS 65/15-45
- 225 ILCS 95/11.5 -
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor