+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 720/2.11 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 7902.11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor