+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Dunn
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/3-114.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-114.1
- 40 ILCS 5/4-110 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 4-110
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor