+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (65)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1077
- Effective Date January 1, 2015
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 111-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 111-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Mulroe
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-003-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary; 009-006-001
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
Senate Amendment 003
Deletes language specifying that the legal disability must be the result of something other than or unrelated to the original cause of action.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill, and makes the following changes: (1) provides that in specified Sections of the Code, in no event shall the period of limitations be stayed in excess of 10 years from the date of the adjudication of legal disability; and (2) specifies that the legal disability must be the result of something other than or unrelated to the original cause of action.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill, and makes the following changes: (1) corrects a typographical error by changing "action" to "cause of action"; and (2) provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act do not invalidate any applicable statute of repose provisions.
House Amendment 001
Corrects a typographical error by changing "action" to "cause of action".
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 735 ILCS 5/13-211 - from Ch. 110, par. 13-211
- 735 ILCS 5/13-212 - from Ch. 110, par. 13-212
- 735 ILCS 5/13-214.3 - from Ch. 110, par. 13-214.3