+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
In the provisions of the School Code concerning high school equivalency, specifies that a State of Illinois High School Diploma is a recognized high school equivalency certificate for purposes of reciprocity with other states and a high school equivalency certificate from another state is equivalent to a State of Illinois High School Diploma.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (29)
- 20 ILCS 505/8 - from Ch. 23, par. 5008
- 20 ILCS 505/35.10 -
- 20 ILCS 1315/25 -
- 20 ILCS 1705/15.4 -
- 105 ILCS 5/3-15.12 - from Ch. 122, par. 3-15.12
- 105 ILCS 5/13-40 - from Ch. 122, par. 13-40
- 105 ILCS 5/26-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 26-2
- 110 ILCS 118/25 -
- 110 ILCS 805/2-22 -
- 110 ILCS 947/50 -
- 110 ILCS 947/52 -
- 110 ILCS 947/62 -
- 215 ILCS 5/500-50 -
- 225 ILCS 65/80-40 -
- 225 ILCS 85/9 - from Ch. 111, par. 4129
- 225 ILCS 235/5 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 2205
- 225 ILCS 427/40 -
- 225 ILCS 441/5-10 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-10 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-27 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-28 -
- 305 ILCS 5/4-1.9 - from Ch. 23, par. 4-1.9
- 305 ILCS 5/9A-8 - from Ch. 23, par. 9A-8
- 430 ILCS 66/80 -
- 625 ILCS 5/6-107 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-107
- 625 ILCS 5/6-408.5 -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-3
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-8 -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-8-1.3 -
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2022: HB5500 - Third Reading
March 2, 2022: HFA0001 - Higher Education
February 16, 2022: HB5500 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor