+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 540/3-2 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.403-2
+ − Vote
March 20, 2007: HB0549 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 20, 2007
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor