+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 14, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0191
- Effective Date July 14, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 5, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2003
- Do Pass Environment & Energy; 007-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment and Energy Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment and Energy Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment and Energy Committee
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes: Provides criminal penalties for retailers and wholesalers who distribute or sell pesticides that have never been registered with the United States Environmental Protection Agency (rather than pesticides not registered with the United States Environmental Protection Agency and the Illinois Department of Agriculture) and makes changes in the definition of "retailer".
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 235/21 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 2221
- 415 ILCS 60/24 - from Ch. 5, par. 824