+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2006
- Arrive in Senate
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Local Government Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Local Government Committee
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Raymond Poe
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/1-1001 - from Ch. 34, par. 1-1001