+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin; -Dillard-Roskam-Silverstein
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Judiciary
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Rules
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-7.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-7.1
+ − Vote
March 6, 2003: HB0547 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 06, 2003
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor