+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 21, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1151
- Effective Date July 21, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 26, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Trust and Payable on Death Accounts Act. Defines the term "beneficiary" and changes references in provisions concerning trust account incidents and payable on death account incidents from "person" to "beneficiary". Contains provisions concerning the distribution of proceeds by an institution. Provides that specified provisions apply to all accounts subject to the Act regardless of the date of execution of the agreement controlling the account. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 205 ILCS 625/2 - from Ch. 17, par. 2132
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2010: HB5469 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 27, 2010
March 12, 2010: HB5469 - Third Reading - Friday, March 12, 2010
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor