+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-2-5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor