+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robin Kelly
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/21-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor