+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kimberly du Buclet