+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (68)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0733
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 114-000-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Munoz
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2022
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
- Re-assigned to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
- Postponed - Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Transportation
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 002
Provides that if a salvage dealer posts annually a bond in the amount of $100,000, up to a maximum aggregate amount of $100,000, with the Secretary of State, the Secretary of State shall automatically process any properly submitted application by the salvage dealer for a salvage certificate or junking certificate and issue the appropriate salvage certificate or junking certificate. Authorizes the Secretary of State Vehicle Services Department to conduct random samplings of automatically processed applications to ensure that the salvage dealer's applications for salvage certificates or junking certificates are accurate. Specifies that applications for salvage or junking certificates submitted by a salvage dealer that are not accompanied by the most current certificate of title are not eligible for automatic processing. Establishes procedures for the suspension of a salvage dealer's right to automatic processing of applications for salvage or junking certificates. Provides that the bond shall be held by the Secretary of State to secure compensation for any owner of a vehicle when it has been determined that the salvage dealer caused the improper transfer of ownership without performing the required procedures. Establishes procedures for the determination of whether a certificate of title of a vehicle was improperly transferred out of an owner's name by a salvage dealer. Provides that if the salvage dealer does not agree to compensate the vehicle owner for the value of an improperly transferred certificate of title, the owner of the vehicle shall be able to seek reimbursement from the posted bond for the loss of the vehicle under a Court of Claims proceeding.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill, and makes the following changes: Relocates language providing that no person shall engage in a street sideshow on any street or highway of the State. Provides that a person may not knowingly interfere with or cause the movement of traffic to slow or stop for the purpose of facilitating street racing or a street sideshow (rather than a person may not knowingly cause the movement of traffic to slow or stop for the purpose of facilitating street racing or a street sideshow). Defines "motor vehicle stunt". Makes conforming changes.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person shall engage in street sideshows on any street or highway of the State. Provides that a person may not knowingly cause the movement of traffic to slow or stop for the purpose of facilitating street racing or a street sideshow. Provides that any person convicted of a violation of the new provisions is guilty of: a Class A misdemeanor for the first offense and is subject to a minimum fine of $250; and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense and is subject to a minimum fine of $500. Makes conforming changes.
House Amendment 001
Adds a provision that knowingly operating a vehicle in a manner that impedes, blocks, obstructs, or otherwise interferes with the movement of another driver or operator upon an expressway or controlled access highway is an offense against traffic regulations governing the movement of vehicles. Adds an effective date of July 1, 2023.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/11-711 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-711
- 625 ILCS 5/11-506
- 625 ILCS 5/3-117.5 new