+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor