+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2021 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 430 ILCS 65/4 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-4
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor