+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
- Session Sine Die
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to January 9, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2006
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2006
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 2, 2006
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lee A. Daniels
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
- Assigned to Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lee A. Daniels
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Disability Services Act of 2003. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to develop a more comprehensive system of community supports and services that will enable persons with disabilities to transition to the most appropriate integrated setting possible in accordance with their needs, preferences, and capacity to be served in that setting. Sets forth that the intent of the Act is to provide a framework for steps to be undertaken by the State of Illinois that will ensure successful implementation of the Olmstead decision. Requires, by January 1, 2007, the Department of Human Services, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and the Department on Aging to cooperatively arrange for the implementation of assessments of the readiness of individuals with disabilities to effect appropriate and medically necessary transitions to the most integrated setting possible, taking into consideration the individual's needs, preferences, and capacity to be served in that setting. Provides that these Departments shall also conduct an assessment of the readiness of the State to effect any transitions that individuals may prefer and require, taking into consideration the availability of resources to accomplish the placements. Sets forth certain requirements for the assessment of the State's capacity. Adds other provisions.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Disability Services Act of 2003. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to develop a more comprehensive system of community supports and services that will enable persons with disabilities to transition to the most appropriate integrated setting possible in accordance with their needs, preferences, and capacity to be served in that setting. Sets forth that the intent of the Act is to provide a framework for steps to be undertaken by the State of Illinois that will ensure successful implementation of the Olmstead decision. Requires, by January 1, 2007, the Department of Human Services, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and the Department on Aging to cooperatively arrange for the implementation of assessments of the readiness of individuals with disabilities to effect appropriate and medically necessary transitions to the most integrated setting possible, taking into consideration the individual's needs, preferences, and capacity to be served in that setting. Provides that these Departments shall also conduct an assessment of the readiness of the State to effect any transitions that individuals may prefer and require, taking into consideration the availability of resources to accomplish the placements. Sets forth certain requirements for the assessment of the State's capacity. Adds other provisions.