+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor