+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 5 ILCS 120/2 - from Ch. 102, par. 42
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207
- 405 ILCS 5/6-103.3
- 430 ILCS 65/8.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8.1
- 430 ILCS 67/5
- 430 ILCS 67/10
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor