+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 8, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans Affairs Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Veterans Affairs Committee
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 18, 2008
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that compensation shall be paid to the person designated by an Armed Forces member killed in the line of duty if a claim is made within 2 (rather than 5) years after the date of death.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 705 ILCS 505/22 - from Ch. 37, par. 439.22
- 705 ILCS 505/24 - from Ch. 37, par. 439.24
- 820 ILCS 315/3 - from Ch. 48, par. 283
+ − Vote
May 13, 2008: HB5370 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2008
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor