+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Revenue Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote; Revenue Sub-committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Exempts from the extension limitation those extensions made for any increase above the amount extended for the 2002 taxable year for contributions to the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund, that part of any extension made for any increase above the amount extended for the 2002 taxable year for Medicare and FICA coverage, and that part of any extension made for any increase above the amount extended for the 2002 taxable year for the expenses of civil liability and liability insurance.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor