+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 007-000-000
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 40 ILCS 5/2-124 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-124
- 40 ILCS 5/14-131 -
- 40 ILCS 5/15-155 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-155
- 40 ILCS 5/16-158 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-158
- 40 ILCS 5/18-131 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 18-131
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor