+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2008
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Assigned to Education
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-002
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Requires each school board to implement a policy (instead of a plan) based on the guidelines for the management of students with life-threatening food allergies.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Requires each school board to implement a policy (instead of a plan) based on the guidelines for the management of students with life-threatening food allergies.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2008: HB5338 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 29, 2008
May 13, 2008: HB5338 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2008
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor