+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor