+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10 ILCS 5/9-1 - from Ch. 46, par. 9-1
+ − Vote
March 27, 2019: HB0531 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor