+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 7, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers