+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 22, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1186
- Effective Date July 22, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 26, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-011-000
On April 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2010
- Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2010
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Judicial Note Filed
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 55 ILCS 5/4-2002 - from Ch. 34, par. 4-2002
- 55 ILCS 5/4-2002.1 - from Ch. 34, par. 4-2002.1