+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 12, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0172
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2005
- Second Reading
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 24, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 015-000-000
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M Gordon
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana A Mendoza
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 570/411 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1411
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2005: HB0529 - Third Reading - Friday, May 20, 2005
February 17, 2005: HB0529 - Third Reading - Thursday, February 17, 2005
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor