+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-015-003
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Margaret Croke
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Margaret Croke
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 25, 2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margaret Croke
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2505/2505-260 new