+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10 ILCS 5/8-1 - from Ch. 46, par. 8-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor