+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke