+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 012-000-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2022: HB5262 - Third Reading
March 9, 2022: HB5262 - Appropriations-Public Safety
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor