+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On July 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading July 21, 2004
- Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
On July 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On May 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 26, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On May 24, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-000
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-001-000
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31,2004
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 9(b); April 30, 2004
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 2, 2004
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from the Act's inspection and copying requirements certain venture capital and portfolio equity information.
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 140/1.1 - from Ch. 116, par. 201.1