+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0722
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 6, 2008
- Sent to the Governor
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2,3
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Trotter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Trotter
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gary Hannig
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gary Hannig
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gary Hannig
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 112-001-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Appropriations I; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2008
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations I
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Assigned to Appropriations I
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-004-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Adds an appropriation of $350,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Public Health for the purposes of the Arthritis Prevention, Control, and Cure Act.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Violence Prevention Authority for its FY 09 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2008.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 120P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 125P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 130P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 135P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 140P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 145P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 150P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 155P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 160. Makes supplemental appropriations for the Department of Transportation.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 120P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 125P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 130P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 135P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 140P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 145P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 150P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 155P.A. 95-348, Art. 360, Sec. 160. Makes supplemental appropriations for the Department of Transportation.