+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill, and makes the following changes: allows employees of facilities subject to the Automotive Repair Act and Automotive Collision Repair Act (instead of mechanics) to possess a vehicle security circumvention device; specifies that language prohibiting the possession or sale of vehicle security circumvention devices by or to persons convicted of certain felonies applies only with respect to convictions within the previous 5 years.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/12-614 new
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2021: HB0052 - Third Reading
March 15, 2021: HFA0001 - Consumer Protection
March 1, 2021: HB0052 - Consumer Protection
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor