+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 23, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1236
- Effective Date July 23, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 26, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2010
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010
- Arrive in Senate
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes new provisions concerning the unauthorized rebroadcast via radio or Internet of intercepted public safety radio communications.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2010: HB5194 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 27, 2010
March 12, 2010: HB5194 - Third Reading - Friday, March 12, 2010
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor