+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022
- Second Reading
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (56)
- 20 ILCS 690/Act rep. -
- 20 ILCS 1305/10-20 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 2310/2310-370 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-610 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 3930/9.2 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.216 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.480 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.502 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.524 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.578 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.638 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.655 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.662 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.718 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.732 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.838 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.917 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.923 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.925 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/6y rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-68 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-71 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.8b rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.23 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.25b rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.25d rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.41 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.42 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.43 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.44 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.45 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.46 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.47 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.48 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.49 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.50 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.52 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.55 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8d rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8e rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8h rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8i rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8m rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8n rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8o rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/9.07 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/8r rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/14.2 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/24.12 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/24.13 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/25.2 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/25.5 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 605/8.2 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 750/Act rep. -
- 415 ILCS 85/7 rep. -
- 430 ILCS 65/5.1 rep. -
+ − Votes (3)
March 23, 2022: HB5191 - State Government
March 4, 2022: HB5191
February 16, 2022: HB5191 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor