+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-003-000
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2016
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
May 26, 2016: HB5187 - Revenue & Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor