+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 3
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. In a Section concerning the film production services credit, deletes a provision stating that the credit may not be carried forward or back and that, in no event, shall the credit reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero. Amends the Film Production Services Tax Credit Act. Provides that for tax year 2005 and thereafter, an Illinois labor expenditure must be exclusive of the salary or wages paid or incurred for the 2 highest paid employees on productions that are 30 minutes or longer (instead of on any production). Provides that the Act is repealed 5 years (instead of one year) after its effective date. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 30, 2004: HB5180 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 30, 2004
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor